Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lammey Dwain, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Potter Mark Dee, against Avalon Check Cashing Corporation A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeirdre H. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: December 20, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Dwain Lammey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.