Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stephen Jordan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Berenji Hossein Farzam, Claery Lance Raymond, against Hoefferle Alyssa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Sarah J. Heidel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah J. Heidel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department K at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101 Hearing |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (RESPONDENT???S AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST (Comment) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List (RESPONDENT???S WITNESS LIST (Comment) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 04, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department K, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Heidel Sarah J. |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections | |
March 18, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department K, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both Judge: Heidel Sarah J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.