Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jacobs Aaron, Sherman Daniel, Sherman Susan, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Broomer Shabnam Sarah, Marvan Jeffrey Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Wada presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2022 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 19, 2022Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: May 19, 2022Ex Parte - Order
Date: May 24, 2022Notice - Notice of Entry of Nunc Pro Tunc Order Correcting Order
Date: May 24, 2022Declaration - Declaration re CAC fees
Date: June 03, 2022Order - ORDER AFTER HEARING APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IN COURT
Date: July 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 07, 2022Notice - Hearing
Date: July 08, 2022Petition - Authority
Date: July 08, 2022Notice - Notice of Entry of Order re Settlement Agreement
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 26, 2022Bond - US Specialty
Date: September 06, 2022PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected
Date: October 03, 2022Miscellaneous Document - Surety rider $12,960,000.00
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Surety rider $12,960,000.00 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2022 | Miscellaneous Document - Surety rider $12,960,000.00 | ||
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Surety rider $12,960,000.00 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2022 | PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected | ||
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bond (US Specialty ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 06, 2022 | Bond - US Specialty | ||
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bond (US Specialty ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.