Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Silva Donald Anthony, Silva Lori Ann, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lori A. Fournier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2022 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order (Establishing Fact of Birth ) | |
September 07, 2022 | Order - Establishing Fact of Birth | ||
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Establish Fact Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Establish Fact of Birth (Initial) filed on March 11, 2022 by Lori Ann Silva, Donald Anthony Silva. ) | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 20, 2022 | PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected | ||
July 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Establish Fact Hearing |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.