Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tielens Stuart K Jr., filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Kim Eleazar D., Xie Matt, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Proudfoot Matthew M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Stuart K Tielens, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 27, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 27, 2022Complaint
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 27, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 29, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 17, 2023Answer
Date: February 14, 2023Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 14, 2023Complaint Filed by Stuart K Tielens, Jr. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Stuart K Tielens, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Stuart K Tielens, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Stuart K Tielens, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.