Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Silverman Stephen A., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Parker C. Brent, against American Express Corporation, represented by Frontino Brian C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 31, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Stephen A. Silverman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: STEPHEN A. SILVERMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN EXPRESS CORPORATION (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STEPHEN A. SILVERMAN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 27, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 27, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 27, 2022Complaint
Date: December 27, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: January 30, 2023Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK
Date: January 30, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 31, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/31/2023
Date: January 31, 2023Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by STEPHEN A. SILVERMAN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by STEPHEN A. SILVERMAN (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.