Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Dhillon Sukhbir S, Dhillon Sukhbir S., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morrow Neal F. Iii, against General Motors Llc, General Motors Llc A Limited Liability Company, represented by Mcbride Mary Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); As to: Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: June 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sukhbir S. Dhillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.