Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ruiz Nathan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Cadry Ryan Shahrad, Moser Jana, against Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Curtiss-Wright Surface Technologies, Hurley Bill, Ultimate Staffing Inc., Ultimate Staffing Inc. Dba Ultimate Staffing, (total of 5) See All represented by Davoudian Shiva Shirazi, Klein Louis C., Moser Jana, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nathan Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Nathan Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: Bill Hurley (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nathan Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Bill Hurley (Defendant); As to: Nathan Ruiz (Plaintiff)
Date: May 11, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.