Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Doe Clg03439 John, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by De La Cerda Pedro, against Doe Archdiocese, Doe Religious Order, Doe School, represented by Hennigan J. Michael, Smith Daniel S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 29, 2023Notice of Adoption of Master Complaint; Filed by: John Doe CLG03439 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00[Proposed] Order of Coordination Filed by John Doe CLG03439 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Doe CLG03439 (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Filing for Inclusion in JCCP 5101 Filed by John Doe CLG03439 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Doe CLG03439 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.