Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DIEGO RAUL BARRETO VS WATCH CLUB INC., ET AL.
On December 06, 2022 a wrongful termination (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2022
Last Refreshed
June 02, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal with prejudice, entire action: Filed By: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: with prejudice, entire action ; Result Date: ; As To Parties changed from Watch Club Inc. (Defendant), Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant), Anita Nandwani (Defendant), Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff), Simran Nandwani (Defendant), Sahil Nandwani (Defendant) to Watch Club Inc. (Defendant), Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff), Anita Nandwani (Defendant), Simran Nandwani (Defendant), Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant), Sahil Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Diego Raul Barreto on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Diego Raul Barreto as to the entire action |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant) et al. |
|
July 18, 2023 | hearing | Jury Trial (time estimate: 5 days) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
July 18, 2023 | hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference) | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Diego Raul Barreto on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 18, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No |
|
May 01, 2023 | hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 | |
May 01, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
May 01, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
May 01, 2023 | hearing | Jury Trial (time estimate: 5 days) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 01, 2023 | hearing |
Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Permit Plaintiff to file a Fir...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order To Permit Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Permit Plaintiff to file a Fir...) | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); Watch Club Inc. (Defendant) |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant); Simran Nandwani (Defendant); Sahil Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant); Simran Nandwani (Defendant); Sahil Nandwani (Defendant); As to: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
February 07, 2023 | Answer | ||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant) et al. Filed by Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant) et al. |
|
February 03, 2023 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on
Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Anita Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause Re Failure to file Proof o...) | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Sahil Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Simran Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt | ||
February 03, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) | ||
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause Re Failure to file Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Sahil Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Simran Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Anita Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt | ||
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Certificate of Mailing for: As To Parties: | |
December 12, 2022 | hearing |
Updated -- Event scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service to Case Management Conference
Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
December 12, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69
Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Certificate of Mailing for: As To Parties: | |
December 12, 2022 | hearing |
Updated -- Event scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Type changed from Case Management Conference to Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service
Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service: As To Parties: | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 12, 2022 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69
Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
December 12, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for | ||
December 12, 2022 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
December 12, 2022 | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service | ||
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Address for Matthew Rabban (Attorney) updated | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Judge: Hon. William F. Fahey |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff); As to: Watch Club Inc. (Defendant); Suresh Kumar Nandwani (Defendant); Anita Nandwani (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Diego Raul Barreto (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|