Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Pineda Luis, Pineda Pinto Peggy Angelica, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kane Brad S, against Carmen Moreno, Carmen Moreno As Trustee Of The Carmen Moreno Trust, Moreno Carmen, represented by Block Ryan Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Malcolm H. Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CARMEN MORENO (Defendant); Carmen Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: CARMEN MORENO (Defendant); Carmen Moreno (Defendant)
Date: August 09, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-12T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CARMEN MORENO (Defendant); Carmen Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: CARMEN MORENO (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: CARMEN MORENO (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 06, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 06, 2022Complaint
Date: December 06, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2022Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 10, 2023Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: February 02, 2023Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: February 02, 2023First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by CARMEN MORENO (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by PEGGY ANGELICA PINEDA PINTO (Plaintiff); LUIS PINEDA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by CARMEN MORENO (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.