Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roe La John Jw, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Storey Devin M., against Doe Archdiocese, Doe Parish, Doe School, represented by Hennigan J. Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Complaint
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: December 30, 2022Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF JOHN JW ROE LA TO PROCEED UNDER FICTITIOUS NAME
Date: February 01, 2023Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING THE COMPLAINT TO BE SERVED
Date: February 01, 2023Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Allowing The Complaint To Be Served Filed by John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John JW Roe LA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.