Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Water Flower Apparel Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Oneworld Apparel Llc, represented by Baum Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 07, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: OneWorld Apparel, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: OneWorld Apparel, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: OneWorld Apparel, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Water Flower Apparel, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 06, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 06, 2022Complaint
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 15, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: December 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 16, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 16, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: December 16, 2022Declaration of Notice
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, WATER FLOWER APPAREL, FOR ...)
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 13, 2023Answer
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.