Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Devine An Individual Joseph Douglas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yang Michelle Esq., against General Motors Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Brar Darshnik, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: DARSHNIK BRAR (Attorney)
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 12, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 06, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Complaint
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 13, 2022Answer
Date: January 09, 2023First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JOSEPH DOUGLAS DEVINE, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.