Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A. A National Banking Association, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Flewelling Mark T., against Advance Aircraft Training Llc, Advance Aircraft Training Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Ding Ningning, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kevin C. Brazile presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a national banking association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: December 05, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 05, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: December 05, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 05, 2022Complaint in Interpleader
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 12, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 12, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 03, 2023Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a national banking association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a national banking association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.