Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Doe 1664 John, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by De La Cerda Pedro, against Doe Archdiocese, Doe Diocese A California Corporation Sole, Doe Parish, represented by Natelborg Kenneth M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 29, 2023Complaint
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: December 29, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 05, 2022Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING COORDINATION
Date: January 06, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF FILING FOR INCLUSION IN JCCP 5101
Date: January 04, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF C...)
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Filing for Inclusion in JCCP 5101 Filed by John Doe 1664, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Granting Coordination Filed by John Doe 1664, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Doe 1664, (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Doe 1664, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.