Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ELIZABETH PARROTT VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES
On December 05, 2022 an other personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Parrott Elizabeth, against City Of Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2024 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
June 03, 2024 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
May 20, 2024 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Elizabeth Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Elizabeth Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 16, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
December 05, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
December 05, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elizabeth Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29
Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elizabeth Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Complaint | ||
December 05, 2022 | Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET |
|
|
December 05, 2022 | Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE | ||
December 05, 2022 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 05, 2022 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 05, 2022 | Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS | ||
December 05, 2022 | Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet |