Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Boyle Flats Food & Beverage Inc., Koons Alex, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Hall Thomas Montague, against Daleyn Accountancy Inc., Koons Alex, represented by Fukuoka Nicole R., Jeevaprakash Anujan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gail Killefer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Killefer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration In Support of Motion to Disqualify - EKO; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant); As to: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON APRIL 21, 2023) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Ruling on Matter Submitted on April 23, 2023; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: BOYLE FLATS FOOD & BEVERAGE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Reply ISO Def Mtn to Disqualify; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Disqualify Counsel: Filed By: Alex Koons (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Reply to Demurrer to Cross-complaint; Filed by: Tad Yenawine (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Declaration of Alex Koons ISO Mtn to Disqualify; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Oppositions; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Motion to Disqualify - Koons; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Filed by: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Declaration of Erin Oyama ISO Mtn to Disqualify; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BOYLE FLATS FOOD & BEVERAGE, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant); As to: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Order; Signed and Filed by: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 09, 2023Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Reply to Opp to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Tad Yenawine (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: November 29, 2022Answer
Date: November 29, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 30, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY - EKO
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY - KOONS
Date: January 11, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 11, 2023Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: January 11, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: January 30, 2023Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: January 18, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS
Date: January 30, 2023Reply - REPLY TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 09, 2023Order - RULING ON DEMURRER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Reply (to Demurrer to Cross-complaint) Filed by Tad Yenawine (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrer to the Cross-Complaint; Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (RE Motion to Disqualify Counsel) Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Oppositions) Filed by Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint) Filed by Alex Koons (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion to Disqualify - EKO) Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Boyle Flats Food & Beverage, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion to Disqualify - Koons) Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alex Koons (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.