Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Villanueva Benjamin, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Jalbuena Arnel Babiera, Jalbuena Arnel B. Esq., against Behrooz Broukhim M.D. Inc., Chiropractic Health & Wellness Center, Compspec Inc., Huntington Hospital, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Marie Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 24, 2022Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 21, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: June 21, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 21, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 21, 2022Complaint in Interpleader
Date: June 21, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 02, 2022Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader Filed by Benjamin Villanueva (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Benjamin Villanueva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Benjamin Villanueva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Benjamin Villanueva (Plaintiff)
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.