Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Alvarez John, Sibrian Jonathan, Zandian Ardeshir, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Novak Sean M, against Kay& James Inc., represented by Anderton D. Chad, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Kevin C. Brazile presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sean M Novak (Attorney)
Date: January 31, 2023Declaration of John Keeney; Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Ruling: October 5, 2022; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: May 26, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: May 26, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 26, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 22, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 27, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN KEENEY
Date: July 22, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 22, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 22, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: August 11, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: September 21, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2022Order - RULING: OCTOBER 5, 2022
Date: October 05, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF FSC AND TRIAL
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: October 07, 2022Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2022Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 31, 2023Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Complaint) Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Sean M Novak (Attorney)
Date: January 31, 2023First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Ruling: October 5, 2022 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (of John Keeney) Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kay& James, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.