Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Direct Chassislink Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Pride Intermodal Inc. A California Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Wade Janice Marie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Beugelmans Gabriel Esq., Hamideh Belal Ghaleb Esq., Slater Charles C., against Aguirre - Doe 1 Milton, Direct Chassislink Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Pride Intermodal Inc. A California Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc. A Delaware Corporation, represented by Berman Evan Andrew, Covell Farrell Craig Esq., Manasantivongs Alisa, Hunt Kathleen Anne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jill T. Feeney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJill T. Feeney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Milton Aguirre - Doe 1 (Defendant); As to: Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by: Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: October 17, 2023Separate Statement; Filed by: United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: May 09, 2022Complaint
Date: May 09, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 09, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 09, 2022Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 09, 2022Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 09, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 10, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2022Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 30, 2022Answer
Date: June 30, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 05, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: July 06, 2022Answer
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 06, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: July 06, 2022Answer
Date: July 11, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 01, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: August 10, 2022Answer
Date: August 10, 2022Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2022Answer
Date: August 11, 2022Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 16, 2022Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: August 25, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2022Answer
Date: September 09, 2022Answer
Date: September 12, 2022Answer
Date: September 26, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 26, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: September 26, 2022Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT IN-INTERVENTION
Date: September 26, 2022Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION
Date: September 26, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED
Date: October 25, 2022Answer
Date: October 25, 2022Answer
Date: October 28, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Complaint-In-Interventi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Summons (CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Old Republic Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (In-Intervention) Filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc. a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Pride Intermodal, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Janice Marie Wade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.