Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Felipe Francisco, Leon Vania Felipe, Poonsopin Tom, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bakhsheshian Jonathan, against Leon Vania Felipe, represented by Lloyd Abigail W., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff); As to: Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff); As to: Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant); As to: Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate - MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: December 22, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: April 14, 2022Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2022Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: April 14, 2022Complaint
Date: April 14, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 14, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: June 28, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 28, 2022Answer
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: RELIEF TO RULE ON THE MOT...)
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed by FRANCISCO FELIPE (Cross-Complainant); Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Re: Relief to Rule on the Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate (PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE) Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Tom Poonsopin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Vania Felipe Leon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Sixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.