Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vargas Bernardo, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Weck Cory Russell, against Aj 0706, Brilsilco Inc., The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers Inc., represented by Majchrzak David M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2022 |
CategoryOther Professional Malpractice (Not Medical Or Legal) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 25, 2023Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: David M. Majchrzak (Attorney)
Date: September 26, 2023Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: September 25, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Responsive Pleading)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by The Liberty Company Insurance Brokers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bernardo Vargas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.