Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morales Marco, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Valero Joshua, against General Motors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 08, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 08, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 08, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2022Complaint
Date: March 08, 2022Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: March 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 10, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marco Morales (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marco Morales (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Marco Morales (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Marco Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Marco Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.