Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Downtown L.A. Law Group Llp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Azizi Daniel, against Beverly Hills Advanced Pain And Spine, Blake Physical Therapy, California Pain Center, Cedars-Sinai, Center For Orthopedic & Sports Excellence, (total of 20) See All represented by Orr Kendra Lin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a summons filed by the Downtown L.A. Law Group against defendants John Santos Melgoza, Esther Melgoza, Century West Chiropractic, Arash A. DM, Pain and Healing Institute, and Bruce E. Fishman. The summons notifies the defendants tha...
Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 26, 2024Case Management Statement; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Order Case Management; Filed by: Clerk; As to: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-03T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-12T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: February 22, 2022Complaint in Interpleader
Date: February 22, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the court should not impose $250 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP, LLP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the court should not impose $250 ...))
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.