Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ldt Consulting Inc. A Corporations Under The Laws Of California, Biller Dimitrios P., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Biller Dimitrios P., against Silverman Stephen, Silverman & Milligan Llp, Parker C. Brent, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2022 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321155); Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B321155, NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 19, 2022Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for a Temporary...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Special Motion to Strike under CCP Sec...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B321155, NA) Filed by Clerk
Date: July 19, 2022Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed ((B321155)) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 26, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an OSC/TRO)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for a Temporary...))
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Exhibit "28" a Copy of the Complaint in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE FILING AND DECL.)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for an Order to Conduct Discovery While Anti-SLAPP MOtion Pending)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order to ...))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Volume II in Support of the Ex Parte Application for a OSC/TRO and Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Reply (in Support Of Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Dimitrios P. Biller)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (Ex Parte Opposition)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. of Biller)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order to Conduct Discovery)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (of ADA Reasonable Accommodations)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application of an OSC/TRO)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Special Motion to Strike under CCP Sec...))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an OSC/TRO)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/02/2022)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for a Temporary...))
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application of an OSC/TRO)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order to Conduct Discovery)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE FILING AND DECL.)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.