Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
L.A. Arena Funding Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Buckley Richard, Buckley Richard D., against Cutting Edge Consulting Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Timothy P. Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 19, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 19, 2022Complaint
Date: January 19, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 27, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR CIVIL JUD...)
Date: February 08, 2022Stipulation for Judgment
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF JUDGMENT LIEN
Date: March 08, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 15, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice (of Order Approving Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Notice of Entry of Judgment)
Date: February 15, 2022Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Judgment Lien)
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Entry of Stipulation for Civil Jud...))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 15, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.