Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Anna Ingram An Individual As Successors In Interest To Decedent Elisa Carbajal, Elsa Espino As Successors In Interest To Decedent Elisa Carbajal, Espino Elsa, Garcia Laura, Ingram Ann, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Leight Michael Edward, against Cynthia Maldonado As A Trustee Of The Victor And Cynthia Maldonado Revocable Trust, Maldonado Cynthia, Maldonado Victor, Victor Maldonado As Trustee Of The Victor And Cynthia Maldonado Revocable Trust, represented by Swain Gregory Peter, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Gregory Swain; Filed by: Cynthia Maldonado (Respondent)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Cynthia Maldonado (Respondent)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION BY SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 10, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: March 10, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: March 10, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: March 10, 2022Petition - COMPLAINT FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE
Date: March 10, 2022Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 05, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LEIGHT
Date: June 15, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: June 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 22, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER
Date: August 15, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 15, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 15, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 08, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 03, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/03/2022
Date: October 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER
Date: October 19, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (1ST)
Date: October 25, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 21, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY SWAIN
Date: November 21, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: December 13, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: December 30, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 30, 2022Declaration (by Successor in Interest)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Complaint for Financial Elder Abuse
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.