Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth, Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth A California Nonprofit Public Benefit Corporation, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Kahn Corin L, Kropp Kristina, against Belmont Village Landlord 4 Lp, City Of Los Angeles, Belmont Village L.P. A Delaware Limited Partnership, City Of Los Angeles A Municipal Corporation, Westwood Presbyterian Church Of Los Angeles California A California Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Brothers Amy, Phelan Kathryn C., Rusin Trevor L, Mamalakis Damon P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Related Case; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of status conference; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Request FOR HEARING; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re CEQA Assignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Statement of the Case OF ISSUES; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice OF RULING; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of case reassignment; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Belmont Village Landlord 4, LP (Respondent)
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 07, 2023Brief OPENING BRIEF; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice of CEQA Settlement Meeting; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice OF ORDERS MADE JULY 28, 2022; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Certificate OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Certified Administrative Record; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Lodging JOINT APPENDIX; Filed by: Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: February 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 24, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RELATED CASES WITH 22STCP00655
Date: March 07, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 14, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 11, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/14/2022
Date: March 14, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: March 18, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 21, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINSTRATIVE RECORD
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: March 23, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: April 07, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 13, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/18/2022
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 18, 2022Request - REQUEST FOR HEARING
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: May 17, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASES)
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: June 17, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: June 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 28, 2022Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: July 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS MADE JULY 28, 2022
Date: August 02, 2022Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE OF ISSUES
Date: August 29, 2022Answer
Date: August 30, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: September 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING
Date: October 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: November 02, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: November 03, 2022Brief - BRIEF OPENING BRIEF
Date: December 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Opposition - RESPONDENT'S AND REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST'S JOINT OPPOSITION BRIEF
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING JOINT APPENDIX
Date: February 08, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: March 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: March 09, 2023Notice (of CEQA Settlement Meeting) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Court Order) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 24, 2022Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: February 24, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/25/2022
Date: February 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: February 28, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CEQA ASSIGNMENT)
Date: February 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COURT ORDER
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Brief (OPENING BRIEF) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT APPENDIX) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS MADE JULY 28, 2022) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Request (FOR HEARING) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice (of case reassignment) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Briefing Schedule) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice (of status conference) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Certificate (OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Certified Administrative Record) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of CEQA Settlement Meeting) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case (OF ISSUES) Filed by Westwood Neighbors For Sensible Growth (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice (of status conference)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of Court Orders Re: Assignment of CEQA Case and of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment) of )
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference RE: Related Cases With 22STCP00655)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of Election to Prepare Administrative Record)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of )
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice (of case reassignment)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request (FOR HEARING)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of )
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of CEQA Settlement Meeting)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Court Order)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (AND NOTICE RE: CONTINUED CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 02/25/2022)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.