Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robertson Daryll Dba Blueprint Builders, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dunaev Elan, against Jackson John Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: John Joseph Jackson (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Daryll Robertson on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: John Joseph Jackson (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Default entered as to John Joseph Jackson; On the Complaint filed by Daryll Robertson on
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: John Joseph Jackson (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Order to Set Aside / Vacate (Order to Set Aside Entry of Default) Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 23, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Daryll Robertson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.