Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bloom And Emily, Stonesifer Bradley, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Grant Adam D.H., against Synergys Construction, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: May 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: June 07, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: June 23, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 16, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 22, 2022Request for Dismissal; Filed by: EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by EMILY BLOOM and (Petitioner); BRADLEY STONESIFER, (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.