Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Redden, Daniel William, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certified Mail Receipt
Date: December 19, 2022Certified Mail Receipt
Date: December 23, 2022Communication
Date: March 15, 2023Returned Mail
Date: December 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 |
Review Hearing Annual Review Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
May 01, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
April 24, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
April 24, 2023 |
Order Appointing Guardian
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
April 24, 2023 |
Court Trial Half Day Time Estimate - Special Set Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
April 24, 2023 | Letters Issued | ||
March 21, 2023 |
Order Continuing Temporary Guardianship
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
March 15, 2023 | Communication | ||
January 17, 2023 |
Returned Mail Notice of Child Custody Proceeding for Indian Child; Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person |
||
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appointment Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.