Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Phillips, Chelsea Marie Kuehne, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
This complaint is a petition for probate of a lost will and for letters testamentary or letters of administration. The case number is 22PR00612. The petitioner, Chelsea Marie Kuehne Phillips, is requesting that the decedent's will and codicils, if an...
Petition Hearing
Date: December 20, 2022Letters Issued
Date: December 20, 2022Inventory and Appraisal
Date: March 13, 2023Notice
Date: March 03, 2023Creditor's Claim
Date: March 06, 2023Notice
Date: February 06, 2023Notice
Date: January 05, 2023Notice
Date: January 05, 2023Order Appointing Administrator
Date: December 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 20, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: December 20, 2022Petition to Administer Estate
Date: November 14, 2022Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: November 17, 2022Proof or Affidavit of Publication
Date: December 08, 2022Review Hearing
Date: December 19, 2023Waiver
Date: April 13, 2023Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim
Date: March 30, 2023Petition Hearing
Date: April 23, 2024Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: March 21, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 23, 2024Waiver
Date: April 13, 2023Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution
Date: March 15, 2024Status Report
Date: December 04, 2023Minute Order
Date: December 19, 2023Waiver
Date: April 13, 2023Inventory and Appraisal
Date: March 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2024 |
Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The First and Final Report of Administrator is settled and approved, and the matter is set for a final discharge hearing on October 22, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall submit a form of order within two weeks. |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition for Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Review Hearing Final Distribution; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
April 10, 2024 | Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim | ||
March 21, 2024 | Notice of Hearing - Probate | ||
March 15, 2024 |
First and Final Report of Administrator on Waiver of Accounting and Petition for Final Distribution Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution |
||
March 15, 2024 |
Inventory and Appraisal - Final Inventory and Appraisal |
||
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.