Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hardy Jean M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Forest River Inc., Mike Thompson Rv 3, represented by Gardner Matthew Austin, Halvorsen Michael Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Lee W. Tsao presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee W. Tsao Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION BASED ON FORUM NON-CONVENIENS; Filed by: FOREST RIVER INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FOREST RIVER INC. (Defendant); MIKE THOMPSON RV 3 (Defendant)
Date: October 18, 2023Trial Setting Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Declaration of Jean M. Hardy; Filed by: JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Order /RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FOREST RIVER INC. (Defendant); MIKE THOMPSON RV 3 (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 12, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Filed By: JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Order /ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MIKE THOMPSON RV 3 (Defendant); As to: JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 19, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 19, 2022Complaint
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 26, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION BASED ON FORUM NON-CONVENIENS Filed by FOREST RIVER INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by MIKE THOMPSON RV 3 (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JEAN M HARDY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.