Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alvarez Valentin, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Kirnos Roger, against Nissan North America Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Wish Automotive Iii Inc. A California Corporation Dba Nissan Of Alhambra, represented by Gilefsky Judd, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Olivia Rosales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: June 23, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: December 06, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 06, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 11, 2023Answer
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by WISH AUTOMOTIVE III, INC., a California Corporation dba NISSAN OF ALHAMBRA (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by VALENTIN ALVAREZ (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.