Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Quintana Blandon Edwin Antonio, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Quintero Guerrero Anel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2022 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 17, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Anel Quintero Guerrero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 13, 2022Complaint
Date: October 13, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 13, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 13, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2022Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2022Answer
Date: November 07, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 17, 2023Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Anel Quintero Guerrero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (summons and complaint) Filed by Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by Anel Quintero Guerrero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Edwin Antonio Quintana Blandon (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.