Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valle Armando, Caballero Elvis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Noravian Carlo, against Macareno Shantel, Cevallos Erik, represented by Hern Esq Kristine L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Erik Cevallos (Defendant); Shantel Macareno (Defendant)
Date: November 15, 2022Complaint Filed by Elvis Caballero (Plaintiff); Armando Valle (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Elvis Caballero (Plaintiff); Armando Valle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Elvis Caballero (Plaintiff); Armando Valle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Erik Cevallos (Defendant); Shantel Macareno (Defendant)
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Erik Cevallos (Defendant); Shantel Macareno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Erik Cevallos (Defendant); Shantel Macareno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Elvis Caballero (Plaintiff); Armando Valle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.