Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fernandez Luna An Individual Julio Adrian, Reynoso An Individual Sara Noemi, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Jacobson Kevin, against Fca Us Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Hanson Erin E, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with David A. Rosen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 04, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 14, 2022Complaint
Date: December 14, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 14, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 14, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 15, 2022Answer
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.