Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Torres An Individual Claudia G, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Jacobson Kevin, against Fca Us Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Yasuzawa Brian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with David A. Rosen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability ? Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act¿(Lemon Law) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 21, 2023Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Claudia G Torres, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: September 28, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Claudia G Torres, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 04, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Claudia G Torres, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Claudia G Torres, an individual (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.