Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Duran Delia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carney Christopher, against City Of Glendale A Public Entity, represented by Arias Carl Bernard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with David A. Rosen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Glendale, a public entity (Defendant); As to: Delia Duran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Delia Duran (Plaintiff); As to: City of Glendale, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Delia Duran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Glendale, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 04, 2023Complaint
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 06, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 12, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2023Answer
Date: January 09, 2023Complaint Filed by Delia Duran (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Delia Duran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Delia Duran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Glendale, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Delia Duran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.