Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Grant, John, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Report Filed | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for investigator fees | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection - No Fee | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List Filed | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.