Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2022 |
CategoryPetition For Custody And Support Of Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party Served: Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana; Respondent Vera Martinez, Ivan |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCSS-Order After Hearing Party: Other Party Department of Child Support Services |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Party: Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Party: Other Party Department of Child Support Services; Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing Date 2: 04/04/2022 |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration Party: Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service FL Date Served: 03/30/2022 |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party Served: Respondent Vera Martinez, Ivan |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Completion of Co-Parenting Class Party: Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party Served: Petitioner Estrada Rodriguez, Fabiana |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.