Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Michael M Stewart Trust, The Michael M. Stewart Trust, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clarke, Matthew M, against Stewart, Ian Alban, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Norman Colavincenzo, the trustee of the Michael M. Stewart Trust, against Ian Alban Stewart Sr. and fictitious parties Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges several violations, including breach of fiduciary duty, gross n...
Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: February 10, 2024Defendants' Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 202422.10.27 Summons flat1
Date: October 27, 202222.10.26 Cover Sheet Addendum flat
Date: October 27, 202222.10.26 Cover Sheet flat
Date: October 27, 202222.10.03 Complaint Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Date: October 27, 202223.03.10 Summons on FAC flat
Date: March 10, 2023Answer by Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Sr. to First Amended Complaint
Date: May 03, 2023Answer by Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Jr. to First Amended Complaint
Date: May 03, 202323.10.06 App and Memo
Date: October 06, 202323.10.05 - Notice of hearing
Date: October 06, 202323.10.05 - Norman Declaration W Exs
Date: October 06, 202323.10.06 Application for Writ f
Date: October 06, 202323.10.06 Application for Writ f
Date: October 10, 202323.10.06 App and Memo
Date: October 10, 202323.10.05 - Notice of hearing
Date: October 10, 202323.10.05 - Norman Declaration W Exs
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
February 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants' Case Management Statement | |
November 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Sr. in Support of Opposition by Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Sr. to Plaintiff’s Application for Right to Attach Order and for Writ of Attachment | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of J. Paul Gignac in Support of Opposition by Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Sr. to Plaintiff’s Application for Right to Attach Order and for Writ of Attachment | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Norman Colavincenzo in Support of Plaintiff’s Application for Right to Attach Order and for Writ of Attachment | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition by Defendant Ian Alban Stewart Sr. to Plaintiff’s Application for Right to Attach Order and for Writ of Attachment | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 23.10.06 Application for Writ f | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 23.10.06 App and Memo | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 23.10.05 - Notice of hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.