Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Figone, Stefanie, Petree, Donna, Santa Maria Elementary Education Association Cta Nea, White, Kristy, filed a(n) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) case against Santa Maria-Bonita School District, represented by Mcglocklin, Paul Z, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
This complaint is a Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Stefanie Figone, Donna Petree, Kristy White, and the Santa Maria Elementary Education Association (SMEEA) against the Santa Maria-B...
Joint Request for Continuance of Hearing
Date: April 18, 2024Joint Request for Continuance of Hearing
Date: April 17, 2024Joint_Request_for_Contin_13_2024_Hearing_Date
Date: February 05, 2024Proof_of_Service_Re_Join_ntinuance_of_Hearing
Date: February 05, 2024Notice of Change of Address
Date: December 21, 2023Petition for Writ of Mandate, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Peitition_for_Writ_of_Mandate_SMEA_FINAL
Date: September 26, 2022Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet_SMEA
Date: September 26, 2022Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet_Addendum_SMEA
Date: September 26, 2022Summons_SMEA
Date: September 26, 2022Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Proof_of_Service_of_Summons
Date: October 17, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Answer to Petition
Date: November 07, 2022Proof_of_Service
Date: October 30, 2023Notice_of_Hearing_on_Mer_for_Writ_of_Mandate
Date: October 30, 2023Proof_of_Service_of_Noti_for_Writ_of_Mandate_
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Request for Continuance of Hearing | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Request for Continuance of Hearing | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint_Request_for_Contin_13_2024_Hearing_Date | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof_of_Service_Re_Join_ntinuance_of_Hearing | |
February 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_02_02_Joint_Request_ce_of_Hearing_final_ | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof_of_Service_of_Noti_for_Writ_of_Mandate_ | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof_of_Service | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Hearing_on_Mer_for_Writ_of_Mandate | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.