Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
C M, John Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lewis, James W, against Doe 1, Lompoc Unified School District, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is an amendment to a previous complaint in a legal case. The plaintiff initially designated the defendant by a fictitious name and now wants to substitute the true name of the defendant wherever the fictitious name appears in the compl...
94729Plain00fa2a
Date: March 27, 2024Declaration re Motion to Compel (signed)
Date: February 06, 2024Opposition Motion to Compel (signed)
Date: February 06, 2024Doe_CM_Notice_of_Continu_anagement_Conference
Date: February 02, 202490379Proof0331bb
Date: January 19, 202490379PLAIN019f99
Date: January 19, 202490379PLAIN0031fa
Date: January 19, 202461570COMPL007556
Date: August 06, 202261570Civil01a983
Date: August 06, 202261570Summo02dc57
Date: August 06, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 202261916Civil008248
Date: August 12, 202262416Notic006771
Date: August 23, 202262761ATTOR001387
Date: August 30, 202262761MENTA014bf4
Date: August 30, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Certificate, Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Certificate, Filed
Date: August 30, 202268799CaseM006647
Date: January 05, 202376157CaseM008490
Date: May 22, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 22, 202376802Notic004634
Date: June 02, 202376845Notic001668
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance, Filed
Date: June 05, 202377057Notic02e4e8
Date: June 08, 202377057ExPar00d229
Date: June 08, 2023Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Ex Parte Hearing
Date: June 13, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 13, 202377572Amend00be3e
Date: June 16, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 06, 2023Order, Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: June 16, 202378021Notic00ed5b
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Dec_of_BKC_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 07, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Memo_of_P_A_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 07, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Req_for_JN_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint_2
Date: August 07, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Ntc_of_and_Gen_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 07, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Memo_of_P_A_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 09, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Req_for_JN_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint_2
Date: August 09, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Dec_of_BKC_in_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 09, 2023CM_v_LUSD_Ntc_of_and_Gen_to_Pf_COA_Complaint
Date: August 09, 202381330Oppos006543
Date: August 24, 202381633CaseM002127
Date: August 28, 2023Doe_CM_v_Lompoc_Df_Reply_f_Demurrer_to_Pf_COA
Date: August 29, 2023Doe_CM_v_Lompoc_Df_CMC_Statement
Date: August 28, 202381791Reque00bbd8
Date: August 30, 202382484Notic000255
Date: September 08, 2023CM_v_Lompoc_Df_Answer_to_Complaint
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96392PLAIN007c6e | |
April 03, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
/media/1435
Judge: Judge Patricia Kelly |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 94729Plain00fa2a | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration re Motion to Compel (signed) | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition Motion to Compel (signed) | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Doe_CM_Notice_of_Continu_anagement_Conference | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 90379Proof0331bb | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 90379PLAIN019f99 | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 90379PLAIN0031fa | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CM_v_Lompoc_Df_Answer_to_Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.