Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cit Bank, A Division Of First Citizens Bank & Trust Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Khatchadourian, Raffi, against Merkel, Andrew Allen, Steamboat Ranch Capitol Investments Llc, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint
Date: October 19, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 19, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 19, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 27, 2022Declaration
Date: October 27, 2022Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Application With Hearing
Date: October 27, 2022Application With Hearing
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 27, 2022Application for Order
Date: December 14, 2022Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2022Application for Order
Date: December 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession After Hearing as to Defendant Steamboat Ranch Capitol Investments LLC Application for Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession Application for Order Application for Writ of Possession After Hearing as to Defendant Andrew Allen Merkel Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The Court will hear from counsel. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Andrew Allen Merkel Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Steamboat Ranch Capitol Investments, LLC Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession/Turn Over Order and Private Place Order Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Laura Messina in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession/Turn Over Order and Private Place Order Declaration |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession After Hearing as to Defendant Steamboat Ranch Capitol Investments LLC Application With Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.