Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by The Lyman Group dba Grow West against Virdi Farms, Inc., Kevin Vu, Dean Trinh, and Kevin Sparks. The complaint alleges a breach of contract. According to the document, there was an agreement made between Gr...
Summons 22069
Date: October 21, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet 22069
Date: October 21, 2022Complaint 22069
Date: October 21, 2022First Amended Complaint 11-9-2022
Date: November 09, 2022Proof of Service of Summons 22069
Date: December 08, 202267653Answe003aa2
Date: December 10, 202267707Answe00fefe
Date: December 12, 202267737Answe00f480
Date: December 13, 202267737Proof01f998
Date: December 13, 202267737Proof012679
Date: December 13, 202267737Proof011c47
Date: December 13, 202267737Answe00eb0c
Date: December 13, 202267737Answe00d6e7
Date: December 13, 2022Proof of Service of Summons 22069 (2)
Date: December 30, 2022Proof of Service of Summons 22069 (3)
Date: December 30, 2022Case Management Statement 22069
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 22069
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 3-1-23
Date: March 01, 2023Case Management Statement (2)
Date: March 02, 2023Request to Enter Default 22069
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Continued Case Management Conference 22069
Date: March 02, 202372265CaseM01e439
Date: March 11, 202372265Notic005c13
Date: March 11, 202372265Notic00b2bc
Date: March 11, 202372265CaseM01a27b
Date: March 11, 202372265CaseM01c231
Date: March 11, 202372265Notic00e6da
Date: March 11, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 22069 (4)
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion 22069
Date: May 03, 2023Declaration of Steven M. Koch in Support of Motion 22069
Date: May 03, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities 22069
Date: May 03, 2023Proposed Order 22069
Date: May 03, 2023Trial Brief 6-28-23
Date: June 28, 2023Request for Judicial Notice 7-19-23
Date: July 19, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Case 10-18-23
Date: October 18, 2023Request for Dismissal without Prejudice 10-18-23
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case 10-18-23 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice 10-18-23 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Stay Lifted | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement Filed | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief Filed | |
September 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV02329 LYMAN GROUP DBA GROW WEST v. VIRIDI FARMS et al PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Plaintiff’s unopposed motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued pursuant to Code of C... | |
September 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV02329 LYMAN GROUP DBA GROW WEST v. VIRIDI FARMS et al PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Plaintiff’s unopposed motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued pursuant to Code of C... | |
September 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV02329 LYMAN GROUP DBA GROW WEST v. VIRIDI FARMS et al PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Plaintiff’s unopposed motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued pursuant to Code of C... | |
September 16, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV02329 LYMAN GROUP DBA GROW WEST v. VIRIDI FARMS et al PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Plaintiff’s unopposed motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued pursuant to Code of C... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.