John Doe, An Individual,
filed a(n)
Personal Injury -
Torts
case
represented by
Travis M. Daniels,
against
Perpetrator, An Individual,
Roe Church, A Religious Organization,
Roe Religious Entity 1, A Religious Organization,
Roe Religious Entity 2, A Religious Organization,
Roe Religious Entity 3, A Religious Educational Organization,
(total of 6)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Details for
John Doe, An Individual v. Perpetrator, An Individual
, et al.
Unlimited Civil (Other Personal Injury/Propert...)
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Practice Area
Torts
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. The plaintiff, identified as John Doe, is seeking damages for various violations, including negligence, negligent supervision/training/hirin...
Case Events for
John Doe, An Individual v. Perpetrator, An Individual
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
April 13, 2023
Initial Case Management Conference
April 11, 2023
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling Published for 04/13/2023 2:30 PM Initial Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling
March 14, 2023
Docket Event
Updated -- Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Sealing Certificates of Merit; Allowing Service on Defendant's and Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Fictitious Name: Exact Name: Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Sealing Certificates of Merit; Allowing Service on Defendant's and Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Fictitious Name As To Parties: removed Updated -- Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Sealing Certificates of Merit; Allowing Service on Defendant's and Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Fictitious Name: Exact Name: Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Sealing Certificates of Merit; Allowing Service on Defendant's and Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Fictitious Name As To Parties: removed Document
March 14, 2023
Docket Event
Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) Document
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Lodging NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) Document
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) FOR ORDER SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT; (2) FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW AND FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE DEFENDANT; AND (3) FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) As to: Roe Religious Entity 1, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 2, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 3, a Religious Educational Organization (Defendant) et al. Document
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
Updated -- Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) FOR ORDER SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT; (2) FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW AND FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE DEFENDANT; AND (3) FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS: Result: Granted Result Date: 03/14/2023 Updated -- Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) FOR ORDER SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT; (2) FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW AND FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE DEFENDANT; AND (3) FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS: Result: Granted Result Date: 03/14/2023 Document
December 29, 2022
Docket Event
Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) As to: Roe Religious Entity 1, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 2, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 3, a Religious Educational Organization (Defendant) et al. Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: John Doe, an individual (Plaintiff) As to: Roe Religious Entity 1, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 2, a Religious Organization (Defendant); Roe Religious Entity 3, a Religious Educational Organization (Defendant) et al. Document
December 01, 2022
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Somnath Raj Chatterjee in Department 517 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment
December 01, 2022
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Event