Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clippinger, Leticia Marie, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Zwinger, Curtis Lee, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kurt W. Worley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2022 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Mediated Agreement 06/20/2022; No Appearances Dismiss Case Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.