Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maria Diaz, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Joshua Joseph Zokaeem, against 99 Cents Only Stores, Llc., in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
61638Compl00ae58
Date: August 08, 202261638Summo01306f
Date: August 08, 202261638Civil02634d
Date: August 08, 202270943Proof00c939
Date: February 15, 202375290Reque00eefb
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 75290Reque00eefb | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 70943Proof00c939 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Assignment and CMC | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 61638Compl00ae58 | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 61638Summo01306f | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 61638Civil02634d |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.